Miller v. Ascendance Apparels, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50064 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Ascendance Apparels, LLC
2600 West Olive Avenue Suite 576
Burbank, CA 91505 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 01/20 12:06 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50064 Closed (MB) |
||
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/19 1:10 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50064 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 12/11 4:06 PM
Order Approving Plaintiff's Second Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Signed on 12/11/2020 (RC) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Fri 12/11 1:23 PM
Certificate of No Objection re: Plaintiffs Second Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Mon 11/16 1:41 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 / Plaintiffs Second Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 12/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/22 7:34 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, June 15, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/15 5:30 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Ascendance Apparels, LLC Mediation due date: 10/13/2020.(Sullivan, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Tue 05/05 12:57 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Ascendance Apparels, LLC . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 2:51 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 12:54 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 1:25 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Ascendance Apparels, LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50064 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 01/21 1:21 PM
Adversary case 20-50064 Complaint by George L. Miller against Ascendance Apparels, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |