Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50067
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:Apr 21, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
ASZ Trading, Inc.
1385 Broadway Suite 1002
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
ASZ Trading, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/21 10:01 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50067 Closed (MD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/20 6:06 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Complaint # 20-50067 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
22 22 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Thu 02/18 9:26 AM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 04/19/2021. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
21 21 notice Mediation - Notice Wed 01/13 10:29 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for February 24, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Sunday, December 13, 2020
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/14 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/13/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Friday, December 11, 2020
19 19 court VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Fri 12/11 2:40 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 3/31/2021. Signed on 12/11/2020. (JS) Modified on 12/11/2020 (JS)
Related: [-] 18
18 18 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Fri 12/11 10:32 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
17 17 notice Notice of Service Tue 09/29 4:04 PM
Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Production and Interrogatories Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
16 16 notice Notice of Service Wed 09/09 2:24 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Admissions Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Withdrawal of Document - Notice Wed 09/09 12:43 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Document Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
14 14 notice Notice of Service Wed 09/02 4:21 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions Filed by ASZ Trading, Inc. (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
13 13 notice Notice of Service Mon 08/24 8:30 AM
Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Admissions Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
12 12 notice Notice of Service Thu 06/25 1:17 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Discovery Requests Filed by ASZ Trading, Inc. (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of Service Mon 06/22 7:35 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Service Wed 05/27 1:29 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Filed by ASZ Trading, Inc. (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
9 9 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 04/27 1:20 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by ASZ Trading, Inc.. (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/27 1:19 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by ASZ Trading, Inc. Mediation due date: 08/25/2020.(Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 2:51 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 12:54 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 1:28 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant ASZ Trading, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50067 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 01/21 1:25 PM
Adversary case 20-50067 Complaint by George L. Miller against ASZ Trading, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives