Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50075
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:Dec 01, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
B H Suntex Enterprises Inc.
1932 East 7th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11223
Represented By
B H Suntex Enterprises Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/01 10:57 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50075 Closed (MB)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 01, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/01 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/01 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, October 30, 2020
11 11 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Fri 10/30 11:26 AM
Default Judgment against defendant B H Suntex Enterprises Inc. Related [+] Tickle due by: 11/13/2020. Signed on 10/30/2020. (JS)
Related: [-] 9
10 10 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 10/30 11:25 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against defendant B H Suntex Enterprises Inc. Related [+] Signed on 10/30/2020. (JS)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, October 29, 2020
9 9 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Thu 10/29 12:34 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 8 8
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgement By Default
8 8 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Thu 10/29 12:26 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 2:51 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 12:54 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 1:31 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant B H Suntex Enterprises Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50075 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 01/21 1:34 PM
Adversary case 20-50075 Complaint by George L. Miller against B H Suntex Enterprises Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives