Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50103
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:Apr 13, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bricktown Square, LLC
8430 W. Bryan Mawr Avenue Suite 850
Chicago, IL 60631
Represented By
Bricktown Square, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, April 13, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/13 10:18 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50103 Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2020
3 3 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 04/09 2:34 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50103 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 01/21 6:46 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50103 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608311, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 01/21 2:51 PM
Adversary case 20-50103 Complaint by George L. Miller against Bricktown Square, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives