Miller v. Broadspire Services, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50109 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 09, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Broadspire Services, Inc.
5335 Triangle Parkway
Peachtree Corners, GA 30092 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 09/09 10:36 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50109 Closed (JS) |
||
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/21 11:08 AM
Order Approving Plaintiff's First Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Signed on 8/21/2020. (RC) |
|
Tuesday, August 18, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Adv)
Tue 08/18 1:35 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiff's First Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Approve Settlement - Motion
Mon 07/27 4:51 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement / Plaintiffs First Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 8/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Notice | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation
Tue 06/30 7:21 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Broadspire Services, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/22 7:40 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation
Tue 06/02 6:14 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Broadspire Services, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Mon 04/27 5:31 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Broadspire Services, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller . (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 2:51 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 1:09 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 1:56 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Broadspire Services, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 01/21 6:46 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50109 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608311, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 01/21 3:25 PM
Adversary case 20-50109 Complaint by George L. Miller against Broadspire Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |