Miller v. Cherry Stix Ltd. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50122 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 27, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Cherry Stix Ltd.
525 7th Avenue Suite 1006
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
CSCO, LLC
525 7th Avenue Suite 1006
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 05/27 12:09 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case # 20-50122 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 05/27 2:40 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50122 Closed (JS) |
||
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Mon 05/17 4:25 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 07/16/2021. (Felger Esq., Mark) |
|
Saturday, May 15, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Sat 05/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Mediation - Notice
Thu 03/04 10:36 AM
Notice of Mediation Scheduled for April 7, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 12/17 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/16/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Mon 12/14 9:18 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Mark Felger is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Mediation Report due by 3/31/2021. Signed on 12/14/2020. (JS) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Fri 12/11 10:35 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 09/29 4:08 PM
Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Production and Interrogatories Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 09/02 4:24 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions Filed by CSCO, LLC (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 08/24 8:32 AM
Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Admissions Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Service
Thu 06/25 1:36 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Discovery Requests Filed by CSCO, LLC (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/22 7:42 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 05/27 1:36 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant CSCO, LLC's Initial Disclosures Filed by CSCO, LLC (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 04/29 2:34 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by CSCO, LLC. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/29 2:33 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by CSCO, LLC Mediation due date: 08/27/2020.(Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Alias Summons
Thu 03/26 1:53 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants CSCO, LLC, Cherry Stix Ltd.. Tickle due by: 5/26/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 2:51 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 1:09 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 2:08 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants CSCO, LLC, Cherry Stix Ltd.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/22 6:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50122 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610340, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 01/22 12:58 PM
Adversary case 20-50122 Complaint by George L. Miller against Cherry Stix Ltd., CSCO, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |