Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-10161

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Philip Bentley
Case #: 1:20-bk-10173
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2020
Terminated:Feb 15, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Fairway Group Plainview LLC
2284 12th Ave
New York, NY 10027-2316
Represented By
Sunny Singh
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Thursday, February 15, 2024
18 18 4 pgs order Order RE: Application, Final Decree Thu 02/15 4:30 PM
Order of Final Decree Signed on 2/15/2024 Closing Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Related [+]. (Suarez, Aurea)
Related: [-] 17
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 02/15 4:30 PM
Case Closed. (Suarez, Aurea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
17 17 motion Application, Final Decree Thu 02/15 3:27 PM
Application for Final Decree (NOTE: Administrative entry only - DISREGARD) (Suarez, Aurea)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
16 16 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Sat 09/17 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 09/16/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #15 )
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
15 15 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Wed 09/14 9:49 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge James L. Garrity, Jr. to Judge Philip Bentley. Judge Philip Bentley added to the case. (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
misc Add Claims and Noticing Agent Mon 10/19 12:12 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent. Claims Agent, Omni Management Group, Inc., added to the case. (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
14 14 claims Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY) Mon 07/27 5:21 PM
Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: J & J Farms Creamery CO, Inc. (Claim No. 34, Amount $17,810.23) To TRC Master Fund LLC filed by TR Capital Management, LLC.(Ross, Terrel)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 07/27 5:22 PM
Receipt of Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)([LINK 20-10173 jlg] ) [claims,transclm] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14172160. Fee amount 25.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #14
Sunday, April 12, 2020
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Sun 04/12 9:47 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Sun 04/12 9:48 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
13 13 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Tue 03/24 12:12 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of Fairway Group Plainview LLC. (Singh, Sunny)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Schedules Tue 03/24 12:10 AM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule C - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of Fairway Group Plainview LLC. (Singh, Sunny)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2020
11 11 order Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules Mon 03/09 12:14 PM
Order signed on 3/5/2020 Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information: Deadline: 3/23/2020 Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, March 02, 2020
10 10 motion Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules Mon 03/02 3:45 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order Further Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statements of Financial Affairs filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of Fairway Group Plainview LLC Objections due by 3/3/2020,. (Singh, Sunny)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
9 9 order Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules Tue 02/04 2:09 PM
Order signed on 2/3/2020 Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information: Deadline: 3/7/2020 Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
8 8 order Motion, Joint Administration Tue 01/28 5:21 PM
Order signed on 1/27/2020 Granting Motion Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases Related [+]. (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, January 27, 2020
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Tue 01/28 5:23 PM
An Order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Bankruptcy Rules directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Fairway Group Holdings Corp. (2788); Fairway Group Acquisition Company (2860); Fairway Bakery LLC (4129); Fairway Broadway LLC (8591); Fairway Chelsea LLC (0288); Fairway Construction Group, LLC (2741); Fairway Douglaston LLC (2650); Fairway East 86th Street LLC (3822); Fairway eCommerce LLC (3081); Fairway Georgetowne LLC (9609); Fairway Greenwich Street LLC (6422); Fairway Group Central Services LLC (7843); Fairway Group Plainview LLC (8643); Fairway Hudson Yards LLC (9331); Fairway Kips Bay LLC (0791); FN Store LLC (9240); Fairway Paramus LLC (3338); Fairway Pelham LLC (3119); Fairway Pelham Wines & Spirits LLC (3141); Fairway Red Hook LLC (8813); Fairway Stamford LLC (0738); Fairway Stamford Wines & Spirits LLC (3021); Fairway Staten Island LLC (1732); Fairway Uptown LLC (8719); Fairway Westbury LLC (6240); and Fairway Woodland Park LLC (9544). The location of the Debtors corporate headquarters is 2284 12th Avenue, New York, New York 10027. The docket in Case No. 20-10161 (JLG) should be consulted for all matters affecting the case. (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2020
7 7 ans Declaration Thu 01/23 3:44 PM
Declaration of Abel Porter Pursuant to Rule 1007-2 of Local Bankruptcy Rules for Southern District of New York Related [+] filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of Fairway Group Plainview LLC. (Singh, Sunny)
Related: [-] 1
6 6 motion Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules Thu 01/23 3:38 AM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information / Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Extending Time to File (A) Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and (B) Statements of Financial Affairs; (II) Authorizing Debtors to (A) File a Consolidated List of Creditors (B) File a Consolidated List of Debtors' 40 Largest Unsecured Claims, (III) Redact Certain Personal Identification Information for Individual Creditors and Interest Holders, and (IV) Approving Form and Manner of Notifying Creditors of Commencement of These Chapter 11 Cases filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of Fairway Group Plainview LLC. (Singh, Sunny)
Related: [-]
5 5 ans Declaration Thu 01/23 2:37 AM
Declaration of Michael Nowlan Pursuant to Rule 1007-2 of Local Bankruptcy Rules for Southern District of New York Related [+] filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of Fairway Group Plainview LLC. (Singh, Sunny)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 ans Declaration Thu 01/23 2:36 AM
Declaration of Abel Porter Pursuant to Rule 1007-2 of Local Bankruptcy Rules for Southern District of New York Related [+] filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of Fairway Group Plainview LLC. (Singh, Sunny)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 motion Motion, Joint Administration Thu 01/23 2:35 AM
Motion for Joint Administration / Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of Fairway Group Plainview LLC. (Singh, Sunny)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 01/23 2:34 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement / Debtors' Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(a)(1) and 7007.1 and Local Rule 1007-3 . Related [+] Filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of Fairway Group Plainview LLC. (Singh, Sunny)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 19 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 01/23 2:29 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 02/6/2020. Schedule C due 02/6/2020. Schedule D due 02/6/2020. Schedule E/F due 02/6/2020. Schedule G due 02/6/2020. Schedule H due 02/6/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 02/6/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs due 02/6/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 02/6/2020, Filed by Sunny Singh of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP on behalf of Fairway Group Plainview LLC. (Singh, Sunny)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 01/23 4:01 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 20-10173 ) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13690363. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Thu 01/23 8:09 AM
Judge James L. Garrity, Jr. added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]