Miller v. Commonwealth Edison Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50128 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Commonwealth Edison Company
440 South LaSalle Street
Chicago, IL 60605 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 07/08 1:55 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50128 Closed (MB) |
||
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50128 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, April 30, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Commonwealth Edison Company . Filed by George L. Miller . (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Commonwealth Edison Company. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/22 6:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50128 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610340, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50128 Complaint by George L. Miller against Commonwealth Edison Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |