Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50136
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2020
Terminated:Mar 02, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
CPS Energy
7000 San Pedro Avenue
San Antonio, TX 78216
Represented By
CPS Energy
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, March 02, 2020
7 7 notice Dismissal - Notice Mon 03/02 11:17 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50136 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/02 3:48 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50136 Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 2:51 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 1:09 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 2:19 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant CPS Energy. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 01/22 6:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50136 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610340, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/22 1:28 PM
Adversary case 20-50136 Complaint by George L. Miller against CPS Energy. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives