Miller v. David's Place Off Price Clothing Co., Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50153 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 11, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
David's Place Off Price Clothing Co., Inc.
1155 South Boyle Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90023 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, May 28, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Satisfaction of Judgment
Fri 05/28 7:18 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 02/11 10:55 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50153 Closed (SS) |
||
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 01/29 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 01/28/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
court
VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest
Tue 01/26 12:47 PM
Default Judgment Against David's Place Off Price Clothing Co., Inc. Signed on 1/26/2021. (LB) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 01/25 2:10 PM
Order Vacating Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation Order Signed on 1/25/2021. (RC) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Thu 01/21 4:49 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding an Order Reopening the Adversary Proceeding Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 12/19 1:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/18/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Wed 12/16 7:28 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Martin Weis is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Mediation Report due by 3/31/2021. Signed on 12/16/2020. (JS) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Fri 12/11 10:47 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Saturday, December 05, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 12/06 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/05/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 12/03 4:27 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default in Miller v. David's Place Off Price Clothing Co., Inc. Signed on 12/3/2020. (LBr) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv)
Wed 12/02 11:50 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgement by Default | ||
9 | 9
motion
Request for Entry of Default (Adv)
Wed 12/02 11:30 AM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/22 7:48 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 2:51 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 1:25 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 2:43 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant David's Place Off Price Clothing Co., Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/22 6:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50153 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610340, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 01/22 2:10 PM
Adversary case 20-50153 Complaint by George L. Miller against David's Place Off Price Clothing Co., Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |