Miller v. DJMT Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50158 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 03, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
DJMT Corporation
2088 East 1 Street
Brooklyn, NY 11223 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 12/03 3:37 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50158 Closed (MB) |
||
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 11/06 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/05/2020. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 11/06 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/05/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest
Tue 11/03 3:45 PM
Default Judgment against defendant DJMT Corporation. Tickle due by: 11/17/2020. Signed on 11/3/2020. (JS) |
|
11 | 11
court
VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tue 11/03 3:44 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against defendant DJMT Corporation Signed on 11/3/2020. (JS) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv)
Tue 11/03 12:50 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgement By Default | ||
9 | 9
motion
Request for Entry of Default (Adv)
Tue 11/03 12:36 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/22 7:49 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 2:51 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 1:25 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 2:46 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant DJMT Corporation. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/22 6:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50158 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610340, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 01/22 2:16 PM
Adversary case 20-50158 Complaint by George L. Miller against DJMT Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |