Miller v. Cudlie Accessories LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50161 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Cudlie Accessories LLC
1 East 33rd Street 7th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 02/26 10:02 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50161 Closed (SS) |
||
Thursday, February 25, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 02/25 5:12 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case # 20-50161 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
mediation
Mediator's Certificate of Completion
Fri 02/05 12:23 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Felger Esq., Mark) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Mediation - Notice
Wed 01/13 10:47 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for February 4, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 12/17 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/16/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Mon 12/14 11:17 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Mark E. Felger is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Mediation Report due by 6/14/2021. Signed on 12/14/2020. (LBr) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Fri 12/11 10:50 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 09/29 4:14 PM
Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Production and Interrogatories Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 09/02 4:24 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions Filed by Cudlie Accessories LLC (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 08/24 8:36 AM
Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Admissions Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Service
Thu 06/25 1:37 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Discovery Requests Filed by Cudlie Accessories LLC (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/22 7:49 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 05/27 1:41 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Filed by Cudlie Accessories LLC (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 04/27 12:36 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Cudlie Accessories LLC. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/27 12:35 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Cudlie Accessories LLC Mediation due date: 08/25/2020.(Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 2:51 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 1:09 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 2:35 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Cudlie Accessories LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/22 6:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50161 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610340, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 01/22 2:24 PM
Adversary case 20-50161 Complaint by George L. Miller against Cudlie Accessories LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |