Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50170
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2020
Terminated:Dec 07, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
iApparel Brands LLC
1407 Broadway, Suite 1721
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
iApparel Brands LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, December 07, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/07 2:07 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50170 Closed. (FMo)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 15, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 11/16 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 11/15/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 11/16 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 11/15/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, November 13, 2020
11 11 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Fri 11/13 2:19 PM
Default Judgment against defendant iApparel Brands LLC fdba iApparel LLC. Related [+] Tickle due by: 11/30/2020. Signed on 11/13/2020. (JS)
Related: [-] 9
10 10 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 11/13 2:17 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against defendant iApparel Brands LLC fdba iApparel LLC, Related [+] Signed on 11/13/2020. (JS)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, November 12, 2020
9 9 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Thu 11/12 2:51 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 8 8
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgement by Default
8 8 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Thu 11/12 2:30 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 1:33 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 3:57 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant iApparel Brands LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 01/22 6:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50170 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610340, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/22 2:50 PM
Adversary case 20-50170 Complaint by George L. Miller against iApparel Brands LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives