Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50180
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2020
Terminated:Sep 09, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Elite Performance Footwear LLC
Represented By
Elite Performance Footwear LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/09 7:48 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50180 Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
13 13 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 09/08 5:58 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50180 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
12 12 motion Stipulation Mon 08/10 2:04 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Elite Performance Footwear LLC . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
11 11 motion Stipulation Tue 07/07 10:44 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Elite Performance Footwear LLC . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Service Mon 06/22 7:55 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures. Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) Modified on 6/22/2020 (BA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
9 9 motion Stipulation Wed 06/03 11:21 AM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Elite Performance Footwear LLC . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
8 8 motion Stipulation Thu 05/07 8:02 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Elite Performance Footwear LLC . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 1:25 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 3:00 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Elite Performance Footwear LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 01/22 6:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50180 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610340, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/22 3:13 PM
Adversary case 20-50180 Complaint by George L. Miller against Elite Performance Footwear LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives