Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50186
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2020
Terminated:Feb 01, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Indecor LLC
34 West 33rd Street, 2nd Floor
New York, NY 10001
Represented By
Indecor LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, February 03, 2022
26 26 misc Status Report Thu 02/03 12:47 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to The Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/01 5:23 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case # 20-50186 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/01 9:09 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50186 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
24 24 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Fri 12/03 3:12 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 02/1/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
23 23 mediation Mediation Status Report Tue 10/19 1:57 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
22 22 misc Status Report Fri 10/01 7:23 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Actions Assigned to the Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
21 21 mediation Mediation Status Report Tue 07/20 4:01 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 18, 2021
20 20 mediation Mediation Status Report Fri 06/18 1:11 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
19 19 mediation Mediation Status Report Tue 05/18 3:45 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 15, 2021
18 18 court Mediator Report Past Due Sat 05/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
17 17 court Mediator Report Past Due Thu 04/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
16 16 notice Mediation - Notice Wed 01/13 10:51 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for February 15, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
15 15 notice Notice of Service Tue 12/15 1:26 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 13, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/14 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/13/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, December 11, 2020
13 13 court VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Fri 12/11 3:09 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 6/11/2021. Signed on 12/11/2020. (MB)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Fri 12/11 10:54 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
11 11 notice Mediation - Notice Wed 10/07 11:07 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for November 5, 2020 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 08/12 3:59 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] Filed by Indecor LLC Mediation due date: 12/10/2020.(Slaugh, David)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 26, 2020
9 9 cmp Alias Summons Thu 03/26 1:58 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Indecor LLC. Related [+] Tickle due by: 5/26/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, March 19, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/11 9:10 PM
Amended Complaint to Amend Demand Amount Filed by George L. Miller Related [+] (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 1:33 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 4:04 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Indecor LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 01/22 6:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50186 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610340, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/22 3:34 PM
Adversary case 20-50186 Complaint by George L. Miller against Indecor LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives