Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50197
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2020
Terminated:Nov 20, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
iWorld LLC
65 West 36th Street, Floor 11
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
iWorld LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, November 20, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 11/20 1:51 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50197 Closed (LBr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2020
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/19 5:27 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50197 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 12, 2020
19 19 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Mon 10/12 11:02 AM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 12/11/2020. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
18 18 notice Mediation - Notice Mon 09/21 3:19 PM
Notice of Mediation to be held on October 16, 2020 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, August 14, 2020
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/15 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/14/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 08/14 11:27 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] Filed by Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc., iWorld LLC Mediation due date: 12/14/2020.(Donilon, Gregory)
Related: [-] 8
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
15 15 court VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Wed 08/12 7:56 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] . Signed on 8/12/2020. (JS)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
14 14 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Tue 08/11 11:03 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
13 13 motion Stipulation Wed 07/22 9:22 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and iWorld LLC and Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
12 12 motion Stipulation Tue 06/30 7:25 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and iWorld LLC and Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of Service Mon 06/22 7:57 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures. Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) Modified on 6/22/2020 (BA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
10 10 motion Stipulation Tue 06/02 6:06 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and iWorld LLC and Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
9 9 cmp Alias Summons Thu 04/30 2:54 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc., iWorld LLC. Related [+] Tickle due by: 6/29/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 8
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 27, 2020
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/27 4:23 PM
Amended Complaint to Add Party Filed by George L. Miller Related [+] (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Amended Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 1:33 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 4:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant iWorld LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 01/22 10:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50197 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610570, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/22 4:47 PM
Adversary case 20-50197 Complaint by George L. Miller against iWorld LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives