Miller v. JCV Group LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50204 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 07, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
JCV Group LLC
1000 Sixth Avenue, Suite 300
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merchant Business Credit, Inc.
1000 Sixth Avenue, Suite 300
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 07, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Wed 10/07 12:41 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 10/07 3:07 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50204 Closed (JS) |
||
Tuesday, September 08, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation
Tue 09/08 5:51 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and JCV Group LLC; and Merchant Business Credit, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stipulation
Fri 08/21 1:23 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time Between George L. Miller and Defendant for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation
Tue 07/07 10:30 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and JCV Group LLC; and Merchant Business Credit, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/22 7:59 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures. Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) Modified on 6/22/2020 (BA) |
|
Tuesday, June 09, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation
Tue 06/09 5:49 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and JCV Group LLC; and Merchant Business Credit, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, May 12, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Tue 05/12 6:30 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and JCV Group LLC; and Merchant Business Credit, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 1:33 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 4:18 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants JCV Group LLC, Merchant Business Credit, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/22 10:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50204 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610570, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 01/22 5:15 PM
Adversary case 20-50204 Complaint by George L. Miller against JCV Group LLC, Merchant Business Credit, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |