Miller v. Just Inventory Solutions, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50212 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Just Inventory Solutions, LLC
64 Brentwood Court East
Albany, NY 12203 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 01/06 9:42 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50212 Closed (MD) |
||
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50212 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 08/14/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding . Signed on 8/12/2020. (JS) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Just Inventory Solutions, LLC Mediation due date: 11/5/2020.(Carroll, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 09, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Just Inventory Solutions, LLC . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Just Inventory Solutions, LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/22 10:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50212 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610570, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50212 Complaint by George L. Miller against Just Inventory Solutions, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |