Miller v. Emergency Maintenance Solutions, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50216 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Emergency Maintenance Solutions, Inc.
113 Lakeside Drive
Lakeville, PA 18438 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/26 9:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50216 Closed (AJL) |
||
Thursday, March 25, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 03/25 3:01 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case # 20-50216 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Tue 01/19 3:04 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 03/22/2021. (Felger Esq., Mark) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
mediation
Mediation Status Report
Fri 01/08 3:31 PM
Mediation Status Report (Felger Esq., Mark) Modified on 1/8/2021 (LMD) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Tue 12/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 12/15 1:27 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Mediation - Notice
Tue 12/15 8:35 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for January 28, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, September 21, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Mediation - Notice
Mon 09/21 3:26 PM
Notice of Mediation to be held on November 4, 2020 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/15 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 08/14/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Wed 08/12 8:54 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Mark Felger is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding . Signed on 8/12/2020. (JS) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Tue 08/11 11:05 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/01 11:35 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Emergency Maintenance Solutions, Inc. Mediation due date: 07/30/2020.(Kasen, Jenny) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 1:25 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 3:03 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Emergency Maintenance Solutions, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/22 10:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50216 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610570, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 01/22 6:31 PM
Adversary case 20-50216 Complaint by George L. Miller against Emergency Maintenance Solutions, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |