Miller v. E-Play Brands LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50218 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 22, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
E-Play Brands LLC
25 West 39th Street
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to The Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 10/22 7:50 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50218 Closed (LAM) |
||
Thursday, October 21, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary 20-50218 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Actions Assigned to the Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Felger Esq., Mark) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Tue 06/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice of Mediation Scheduled for April 8, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Sunday, December 13, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/13/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Mediation Report due by 6/11/2021. Signed on 12/11/2020. (MB) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Production and Interrogatories Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Service of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions Filed by E-Play Brands LLC (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Admissions Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Service of Defendant's Discovery Requests Filed by E-Play Brands LLC (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Filed by E-Play Brands LLC (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by E-Play Brands LLC. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by E-Play Brands LLC Mediation due date: 08/25/2020.(Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant E-Play Brands LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/22 10:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50218 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610570, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50218 Complaint by George L. Miller against E-Play Brands LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |