Miller v. Levinsohn Textile Co., Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50251 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Levinsohn Textile Co., Inc.
230 5th Avenue, Suite 1510
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 01/20 9:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50251 Closed (MD) |
||
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/19 1:13 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50251 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, October 12, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Mon 10/12 11:02 AM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 12/11/2020. (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Monday, September 21, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Mediation - Notice
Mon 09/21 2:42 PM
Notice of Mediation to be held on October 12, 2020 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/15 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 08/14/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Wed 08/12 9:13 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding . Signed on 8/12/2020. (JS) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Tue 08/11 11:08 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, April 06, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 04/06 10:07 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Roland Gary Jones, Esq., of Jones & Associates to represent Levinsohn Textile Co. Inc Order Signed on 4/6/2020. (LJH) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 04/06 9:29 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice . Receipt Number 0311-28674, Filed by Levinsohn Textile Co., Inc.. (Tobia, James) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 03/25 2:32 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Levinsohn Textile Co., Inc.. (Tobia, James) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/02 1:35 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Levinsohn Textile Co., Inc. Mediation due date: 06/30/2020.(Tobia, James) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
7 | 7
notice
Appearance - Notice
Mon 03/02 1:33 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Levinsohn Textile Co., Inc. (Tobia, James) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 1:33 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 3:44 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Levinsohn Textile Co., Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/22 10:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50251 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610570, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 01/22 9:08 PM
Adversary case 20-50251 Complaint by George L. Miller against Levinsohn Textile Co., Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |