Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50254
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2020
Terminated:Jul 30, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Merchandise Network LLC
1407 Broadway Suite 1402
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Merchandise Network LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, July 30, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/30 8:19 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50254 Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
10 10 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 07/29 3:31 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50254 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 22, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Service Mon 06/22 8:12 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
6 6 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:13 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
5 5 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 1:33 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
4 4 cmp Alias Summons Thu 02/20 3:47 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Merchandise Network LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 5:01 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Merchandise Network LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 01/22 10:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50254 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9610570, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/22 9:35 PM
Adversary case 20-50254 Complaint by George L. Miller against Merchandise Network LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives