Miller v. Mystic Apparel LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50268 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mystic Apparel LLC
1333 Broadway 6th Floor
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 02/26 10:10 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50268 Closed (ATo) |
||
Thursday, February 25, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case # 20-50268 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Felger Esq., Mark) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for February 3, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/16/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Mark Felger is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Signed on 12/14/2020. (ATo) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Mystic Apparel LLCs, First Set of Requests for Production and Interrogatories Filed by George L. Miller (Gentile, John) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery re: (i) Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admission; (ii) Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production; and (iii) Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories Filed by Mystic Apparel LLC, Mystic Apparel LLC, Wiesner Products, Inc., Wiesner Products, Inc... (Slaugh, David) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Admissions Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Discovery Requests Between Mystic Apparel LLC and Plaintiff . Filed by Mystic Apparel LLC. (Slaugh, David) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Service re: (i) Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents to George L. Miller, not Individually but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J&M Sales, Inc., et al.; (ii) Defendant's First Interrogatories to George L. Miller, not Individually but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J&M Sales, Inc., et al.; and (iii) Defendant's First Requests for Admissions to George L. Miller, not Individually but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J&M Sales, Inc., et al. Filed by Mystic Apparel LLC (Slaugh, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dylan Trache, Esq. Order Signed on 6/5/2020. (RC) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery re: Defendants Initial Rule 26 Disclosures Filed by Mystic Apparel LLC, Mystic Apparel LLC, Mystic Apparel LLC dba Premier Kitchen Products, Wiesner Products, Inc., Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Slaugh, David) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Dylan Trache, Esq . Receipt Number 2976153, Filed by Mystic Apparel LLC, Mystic Apparel LLC, Mystic Apparel LLC dba Premier Kitchen Products, Wiesner Products, Inc., Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Slaugh, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Mystic Apparel LLC. (Ryan, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Mystic Apparel LLC Mediation due date: 09/3/2020.(Ryan, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Mystic Apparel LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/23 9:41 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50268 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9611268, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50268 Complaint by George L. Miller against Mystic Apparel LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |