Miller v. Natco Products Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50272 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Natco Products Corporation
155 Brookside Avenue
West Warwick, RI 02893 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Thu 02/03 12:47 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to The Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 02, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 02/02 9:04 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50272 Closed (JC) |
||
Tuesday, February 01, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 02/01 5:25 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case # 20-50272 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, December 03, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Fri 12/03 3:22 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 02/1/2022. (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Tuesday, October 19, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
mediation
Mediation Status Report
Tue 10/19 9:53 AM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Fri 10/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Fri 10/01 7:23 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Actions Assigned to the Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, July 20, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
mediation
Mediation Status Report
Tue 07/20 4:01 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Friday, June 18, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
mediation
Mediation Status Report
Fri 06/18 1:11 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Tue 06/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Mediation - Notice
Wed 01/13 10:58 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for February 15, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 12/17 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/16/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Mon 12/14 2:42 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Signed on 12/14/2020. (ATo) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Fri 12/11 11:12 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/12 4:12 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Natco Products Corporation Mediation due date: 12/10/2020.(Slaugh, David) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation
Tue 07/07 10:41 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Natco Products Corporation . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/22 8:17 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation
Fri 06/05 5:45 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Natco Products Corporation . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Wed 05/06 2:56 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Natco Products Corporation . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:13 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 9:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Natco Products Corporation. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/23 9:41 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50272 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9611268, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 01/22 10:51 PM
Adversary case 20-50272 Complaint by George L. Miller against Natco Products Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |