Miller v. Panties Plus Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50292 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Panties Plus Inc.
320 Fifth Avenue, 2nd Floor
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Fri 08/21 8:06 AM
Notice of Dismissal and Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 08/21 10:39 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50292 Closed (JS) |
||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/22 8:20 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation
Fri 06/05 5:38 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Panties Plus, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Mon 05/04 6:51 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Panties Plus, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:13 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 10:00 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Panties Plus Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/23 9:41 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50292 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9611268, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 01/22 11:54 PM
Adversary case 20-50292 Complaint by George L. Miller against Panties Plus Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |