Miller v. Pegasus Maritime, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50294 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Pegasus Maritime, Inc.
250 West 39th Street
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 17, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 08/17 12:37 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50294 Closed (SH) |
||
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Mon 08/16 2:40 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary # 20-50294 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
utility
Reopen AP Case
Thu 08/05 12:00 PM
Adversary Case Reopened. (SS) |
||
Wednesday, August 04, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/04 2:00 PM
Order Approving Stipulation and Joint Request to Set Aside Judgment of Default Against Defendant Pegasus Maritime, Inc. Order Signed on 8/4/2021. (LJH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Wed 08/04 12:46 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Proposed Order Approving Stipulation and Joint Request to Set Aside Judgment of Default Against Defendant Pegasus Maritime, Inc. Filed by George L. Miller. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, July 28, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stipulation
Wed 07/28 2:57 PM
Stipulation Stipulation and Joint Request to Set Aside Judgment of Default Against Defendant Pegasus Maritime, Inc. Between George L. Miller and defendant Pegasus Maritime, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, November 24, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 11/24 11:29 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50294 Closed (MB) |
||
Wednesday, November 11, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 11/12 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/11/2020. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 11/12 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/11/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest
Mon 11/09 12:38 PM
Default Judgment against Pegasus Maritime, Inc. Tickle due by: 11/23/2020. Signed on 11/9/2020. (MB) |
|
10 | 10
court
VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 11/09 12:37 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Pegasus Maritime, Inc. Signed on 11/9/2020. (MB) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv)
Fri 11/06 1:39 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgment by Default | ||
8 | 8
motion
Request for Entry of Default (Adv)
Fri 11/06 11:53 AM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:13 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 10:02 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Pegasus Maritime, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/23 9:41 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50294 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9611268, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 01/22 11:59 PM
Adversary case 20-50294 Complaint by George L. Miller against Pegasus Maritime, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |