Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50302
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2020
Terminated:May 14, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority
P.O. Box 363508
San Juan, PR 00936
Represented By
Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, May 14, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Fri 05/14 7:14 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50302 Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/13 5:18 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary # 20-50302 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
16 16 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Wed 02/03 2:07 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 04/5/2021. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
15 15 notice Mediation - Notice Wed 01/13 11:00 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for February 8, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/17 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/16/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Monday, December 14, 2020
13 13 court VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Mon 12/14 11:21 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 6/14/2021. Signed on 12/14/2020. (LBr)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, December 11, 2020
12 12 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Fri 12/11 11:15 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
11 11 answer Response Mon 06/22 3:55 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (Ramirez Polanco, Rafael) Modified on 6/23/2020 (BA)
Related: [-] 1
10 10 notice Notice of Service Mon 06/22 8:21 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
9 9 motion Stipulation Wed 05/06 1:25 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Autoridad de Energa Elctrica . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2020
7 7 motion Extend - Motion Fri 03/06 3:42 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint Filed by Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority. (Ramirez Polanco, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:13 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 10:11 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 23, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 01/23 9:41 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50302 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9611268, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 01/23 12:16 AM
Adversary case 20-50302 Complaint by George L. Miller against Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives