Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50332
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2020
Terminated:Feb 16, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Secret Lace LLC
1410 Broadway Suite 301
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Secret Lace LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, February 16, 2023
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/16 9:53 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case # 20-50332 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/16 12:17 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50332 Closed (TM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
34 34 misc Status Report Wed 08/24 10:07 AM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to The Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Capuzzi, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
33 33 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 02/08 1:04 PM
Notice of Settlement Filed by George L. Miller (Gentile, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
32 32 misc Status Report Thu 02/03 12:47 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to The Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
31 31 notice Completion of Briefing - Notice Tue 12/14 5:30 PM
Notice of Completion of Briefing. Filed by George L. Miller (Capuzzi, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
30 30 motion Request for Oral Argument Mon 12/06 3:29 PM
Request for Oral Argument Filed by Secret Lace LLC Related [+]. (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-] 26
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
29 29 answer Reply Wed 12/01 5:26 PM
Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller (Capuzzi, Kevin)
Related: [-] 26
Monday, November 15, 2021
28 28 misc Brief Mon 11/15 7:05 PM
Answering Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] Filed by Secret Lace LLC. (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-] 26
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Friday, October 01, 2021
27 27 misc Status Report Fri 10/01 7:23 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Actions Assigned to the Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
26 26 motion Summary Judgment(Adv) - Motion Thu 09/30 3:02 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Capuzzi, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
Att: 3 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
25 25 notice Withdrawal - Notice Thu 09/30 2:46 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller (Capuzzi, Kevin)
Related: [-] 24
24 24 motion Summary Judgment(Adv) - Motion Thu 09/30 2:02 PM
WITHDRAWN 09/30/2021 SEE DOCKET25 Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Capuzzi, Kevin) Modified on 9/30/2021 as to wtihdrawal(LAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
Att: 3 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
23 23 misc Status Report Wed 07/07 12:24 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to the Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
22 22 notice VAN-417 Notice and Order of Request for Status Report Fri 06/25 9:57 AM
Notice and Order of Request for Status Report with Certificate of Service. Status Report due by 7/16/2021. Signed on 6/25/2021. (JS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
21 21 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Tue 06/22 11:40 AM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Felger Esq., Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
20 20 court Mediator Report Past Due Tue 06/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
19 19 notice Mediation - Notice Wed 02/10 2:08 PM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for March 10, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/17 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/16/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Monday, December 14, 2020
17 17 court VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Mon 12/14 12:52 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Mark Felger is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 6/14/2021. Signed on 12/14/2020. (LBr)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, December 11, 2020
16 16 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Fri 12/11 11:19 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
15 15 notice Notice of Service Tue 09/29 4:37 PM
Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Production and Interrogatories Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
14 14 notice Notice of Service Wed 09/02 4:38 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions Filed by Secret Lace LLC (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
13 13 notice Notice of Service Mon 08/24 8:52 AM
Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Admissions Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
12 12 notice Notice of Service Thu 06/25 1:57 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Discovery Requests Filed by Secret Lace LLC (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of Service Mon 06/22 8:29 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Service Wed 05/27 2:35 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Filed by Secret Lace LLC (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
9 9 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 04/27 2:20 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Secret Lace LLC. (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/27 2:19 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Secret Lace LLC Mediation due date: 08/25/2020.(Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:48 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:19 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 11:06 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Secret Lace LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 23, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 01/23 1:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50332 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9612186, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 01/23 1:37 AM
Adversary case 20-50332 Complaint by George L. Miller against Secret Lace LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives