Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50334
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2020
Terminated:Feb 16, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Seldat, Inc.
One Cragwood Road Suite 103A
South Plainfield, NJ 07080
Represented By
Seldat, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
15 15 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Tue 02/16 10:21 AM
Order Approving Plaintiff's Third Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Potential Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Related [+] Order Signed on 2/16/2021. (RC)
Related: [-] ument(s)13 ,14
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/16 2:25 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50334 Closed (SS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
14 14 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Wed 02/10 4:58 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Third Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
13 13 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Thu 01/14 1:44 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Third Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Potential Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 2/25/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/4/2021. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
12 12 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 07/31 4:27 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by Seldat, Inc. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
11 11 motion Stipulation Tue 06/30 8:35 PM
Stipulation //Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Serve Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Between Seldat, Inc. and George L. Miller, not individually, but as chapter 7 trustee . Filed by Seldat, Inc.. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Service Mon 06/22 8:30 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/08 7:58 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Seldat, Inc.. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/06 7:53 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Seldat, Inc. Mediation due date: 09/3/2020. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:48 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 4 pgs notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:19 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 11:08 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Seldat, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 23, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 01/23 1:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50334 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9612186, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 01/23 1:41 AM
Adversary case 20-50334 Complaint by George L. Miller against Seldat, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives