Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50336
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2020
Terminated:Dec 30, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sensational Collection Inc
1410 Broadway Suite 508
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Sensational Collection Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
14 14 notice Satisfaction of Judgment Wed 10/06 11:16 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/30 12:33 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50336 Closed (LBr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 12, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/13 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/12/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, December 10, 2020
12 12 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Thu 12/10 3:59 PM
Default Judgment against Sensational Collection Inc Related [+] Tickle due by: 12/28/2020. Signed on 12/10/2020. (LBr)
Related: [-] 9
Sunday, December 06, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/07 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/06/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, December 04, 2020
10 10 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 12/04 9:42 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default in Miller v. Sensational Collection Inc. Related [+] Signed on 12/4/2020. (LBr)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
9 9 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Wed 12/02 12:05 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 8 8
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgement by Default
8 8 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Wed 12/02 11:40 AM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:48 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:19 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 11:18 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Sensational Collection Inc. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 23, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 01/23 1:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50336 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9612186, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 01/23 1:45 AM
Adversary case 20-50336 Complaint by George L. Miller against Sensational Collection Inc. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives