Miller v. Silver Shield, LLC.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50339 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 10, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Silver Shield, LLC.
549 47th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94121 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 03/10 7:26 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50339 Closed (LAM) |
||
Wednesday, March 09, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case # 20-50339 Filed by George L. Miller. (Gentile, John) |
|
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to The Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Actions Assigned to the Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Tue 02/23 3:26 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 04/26/2021. (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for February 24, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/16/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Mediation Report due by 6/14/2021. Signed on 12/14/2020. (LBr) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Service of Defendant's Objections and Responses to First of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions Propounded by Plaintiff Filed by Silver Shield, LLC. (Hauswirth, Gregory) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Admissions Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Service Defendant Silver Shield, LLCs (1) First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff and (2) Defendants Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure Statement Filed by Silver Shield, LLC. (Hauswirth, Gregory) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Silver Shield, LLC. (Hauswirth, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Silver Shield, LLC. Mediation due date: 10/6/2020. (Milo, Stephan) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Silver Shield, LLC.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/23 1:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50339 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9612186, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50339 Complaint by George L. Miller against Silver Shield, LLC.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |