Miller v. Styles West, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50351 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 12, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Styles West, Inc.
3183 Bandini Boulevard
Vernon, CA 90058 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 11/12 4:15 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50351 Closed (JS) |
||
Tuesday, November 10, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 11/10 4:55 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50351 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
mediation
Mediator's Certificate of Completion
Mon 10/26 4:02 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Monday, September 21, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Mediation - Notice
Mon 09/21 3:08 PM
Notice of Mediation to be held on October 23, 2020 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/15 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 08/14/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Wed 08/12 12:25 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding . Signed on 8/12/2020. (JS) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Tue 08/11 11:16 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/06 2:29 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Styles West, Inc. Mediation due date: 09/3/2020.(Joyce, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:48 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:19 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 11:42 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Styles West, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/23 1:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50351 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9612186, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 01/23 2:22 AM
Adversary case 20-50351 Complaint by George L. Miller against Styles West, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |