Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50368
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc.
11 West 42nd Street
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Global Brands Group Holding Limited
350 5th Avenue at Empire State Building 6th Floor
New York, NY 10118
Represented By
Global Brands Group Holding Limited
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
15 15 court Case Reassigned Wed 03/05 9:48 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge Craig T Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge John T Dorsey Terminated (ALD)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
14 14 misc Status Report Fri 01/27 1:55 PM
Status Report on Adversary Case # 20-50368 Filed by George L. Miller. (Capuzzi, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
13 13 misc Status Report Thu 02/03 12:47 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to The Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
12 12 misc Status Report Fri 10/01 7:23 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Actions Assigned to the Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
11 11 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Thu 06/25 7:04 PM
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Filed by Global Brands Group Holding Limited. (Weinstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Service Mon 06/22 8:37 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
9 9 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy - Adversary Fri 06/19 12:56 PM
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
8 8 motion Stipulation Tue 05/12 6:19 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc.; and Global Brands Group Holding Limited dba Planet Sox . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:48 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:19 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 11:56 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Global Brands Group Holding Limited, The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 23, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 01/23 1:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50368 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9612186, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 01/23 3:44 AM
Adversary case 20-50368 Complaint by George L. Miller against The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc., Global Brands Group Holding Limited. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives