Miller v. Top Care Products, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50371 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Top Care Products, Inc.
1859 East 19th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11229 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/26 10:02 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50371 Closed (AJL) |
||
Thursday, March 25, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 03/25 3:02 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case # 20-50371 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Thu 01/14 10:40 AM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 03/15/2021. (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 12/18 1:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/17/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 12/15 1:30 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
15 | 15
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Tue 12/15 12:12 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Mediation Report due by 6/15/2021. Signed on 12/15/2020. (LBr) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Mediation - Notice
Tue 12/15 8:42 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for January 14, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Fri 12/11 11:25 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Sunday, August 16, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Withdrawal of Appearance - Notice
Sun 08/16 10:29 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Joseph J. McMahon, Jr. has withdrawn from the case. Filed by GC Apparel Group LLC, J.E.M. International, Inc., Lati Fashions International Inc., Simex Trading Co. Inc., Top Care Products, Inc.. (McMahon, Joseph) |
|
Sunday, August 02, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Sun 08/02 9:13 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Top Care Products, Inc. Mediation due date: 11/30/2020.(McMahon, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, June 09, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/09 11:44 AM
Order Approving Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant Extending Defendant's Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading Order Signed on 6/9/2020. (RC) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -- Stipulation | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Tue 06/09 12:01 AM
Certification of Counsel re: Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant Extending Defendant's Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading Filed by Top Care Products, Inc.. (McMahon, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Form of Order | ||
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Fri 05/08 9:07 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Top Care Products, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:48 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:19 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 11:59 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Top Care Products, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/23 1:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50371 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9612186, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 01/23 3:49 AM
Adversary case 20-50371 Complaint by George L. Miller against Top Care Products, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |