Miller v. Tovlev Enterprises Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50372 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Tovlev Enterprises Inc.
2850 E. 46th Street
Vernon, CA 90058 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, December 21, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 12/21 3:15 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50372 Closed (JS) |
||
Sunday, December 06, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 12/07 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/06/2020. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 12/07 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/06/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest
Fri 12/04 3:45 PM
Default Judgment against Tovlev Enterprises Inc. Tickle due by: 12/18/2020. Signed on 12/4/2020. (LBr) |
|
10 | 10
court
VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 12/04 3:08 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default on Tovlev Enterprises Inc. Signed on 12/4/2020. (LBr) Modified on 12/4/2020 (SH) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv)
Wed 12/02 12:08 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgement by Default | ||
8 | 8
motion
Request for Entry of Default (Adv)
Wed 12/02 11:43 AM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:48 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:19 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Sat 02/08 12:00 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Tovlev Enterprises Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/23 1:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50372 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9612186, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 01/23 3:51 AM
Adversary case 20-50372 Complaint by George L. Miller against Tovlev Enterprises Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |