Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50384
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2020
Terminated:Oct 07, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
US Home Brands, LLC
12 West 31st Street 5th Floor
New York, NY 10001
Represented By
US Home Brands, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Merchant Business Credit, Inc.
1441 Broadway 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Merchant Business Credit, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
15 15 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 10/07 12:43 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/07 3:08 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50384 Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
14 14 motion Stipulation Tue 09/08 5:53 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and US Home Brands LLC; and Merchant Business Credit, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
13 13 motion Stipulation Fri 08/21 1:29 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time Between George L. Miller and Defendant for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
12 12 motion Stipulation Wed 08/19 1:40 PM
Stipulation Between US Home Brands, LLC and Plaintiff George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J&M Sales, Inc., et al. Extending Time for Defendant US Home Brands, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Adversary Complaint . Filed by US Home Brands, LLC Related [+]. (Mangan, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
11 11 motion Stipulation Tue 07/07 10:49 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and US Home Brands LLC; and Merchant Business Credit, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Service Mon 06/22 8:38 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
9 9 motion Stipulation Tue 06/09 5:53 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and US Home Brands LLC; and Merchant Business Credit, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
8 8 motion Stipulation Tue 05/12 6:35 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and US Home Brands LLC; and Merchant Business Credit, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:48 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:19 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 08, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Sat 02/08 12:18 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Merchant Business Credit, Inc., US Home Brands, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/8/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 23, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 01/23 1:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50384 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9612186, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 01/23 4:16 AM
Adversary case 20-50384 Complaint by George L. Miller against US Home Brands, LLC, Merchant Business Credit, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives