Miller v. US Legwork LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50386 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 07, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
US Legwork LLC
10 West 33rd Street Suite 1209
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 12/07 9:15 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50386 Closed (LBr) |
||
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/12/2020. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/12/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Default Judgment against US Legwork LLC. Tickle due by: 11/24/2020. Signed on 11/10/2020. (MB) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default against US Legwork LLC Signed on 11/10/2020. (MB) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Saturday, February 08, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant US Legwork LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/8/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/23 1:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50386 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9612186, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50386 Complaint by George L. Miller against US Legwork LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |