Miller v. Vault Sportswear, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50391 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Vault Sportswear, Inc.
1407 Broadway Room 2107
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 04/07 10:19 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case 20-50391 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/07 12:40 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50391 Closed (MB) |
||
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Status Report
Thu 02/03 12:47 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to The Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Fri 10/01 7:23 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Actions Assigned to the Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Report
Thu 07/22 12:45 PM
Status Report Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Actions Assigned to The Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, June 25, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
notice
VAN-417 Notice and Order of Request for Status Report
Fri 06/25 9:59 AM
Notice and Order of Request for Status Report with Certificate of Service. Status Report due by 7/16/2021. Signed on 6/25/2021. (JS) |
|
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
mediation
Mediator's Certificate of Completion
Wed 04/14 2:29 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Felger Esq., Mark) |
|
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Mon 03/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 02/22 1:38 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Vault Sportswear, Inc.s, First Set of Requests for Production and Interrogatories Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 01/20 2:24 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Vault Sportswear, Inc.'s, First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by George L. Miller (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Thu 12/17 6:36 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery // Notice of Service of Defendant's (i) First Request for Admissions to Plaintiff, (ii) First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, and (iii) First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Filed by Vault Sportswear, Inc. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Tue 12/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 12/15 1:30 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Mediation - Notice
Tue 12/15 8:43 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for January 7, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, September 21, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Mediation - Notice
Mon 09/21 3:40 PM
Notice of Mediation to be held on October 29, 2020 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/15 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 08/14/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Wed 08/12 12:48 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Mark Felger is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding . Signed on 8/12/2020. (JS) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Tue 08/11 11:24 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 05/27 2:43 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Filed by Vault Sportswear, Inc. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 04/27 12:02 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Vault Sportswear, Inc.. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/27 12:01 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Vault Sportswear, Inc. Mediation due date: 08/25/2020.(Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:48 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:19 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Saturday, February 08, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Sat 02/08 12:23 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Vault Sportswear, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/8/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 01/24 12:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50391 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9613129, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 01/23 4:29 AM
Adversary case 20-50391 Complaint by George L. Miller against Vault Sportswear, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |