Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50404
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2020
Terminated:Feb 20, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
White Line Collections, Inc.
5620 First Avenue Suite 1
Brooklyn, NY 11220
Represented By
White Line Collections, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, February 20, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/20 8:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50404 Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
6 6 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 02/19 5:52 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50404 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Document - Notice Wed 02/19 5:50 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Document Number 4 Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 4
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, February 14, 2020
4 4 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 02/14 4:21 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50404 Filed by George L. Miller. Tickle due by: 2/28/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 08, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Sat 02/08 12:35 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant White Line Collections, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/8/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 24, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 01/24 12:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50404 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9613129, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2020
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 01/23 5:03 AM
Adversary case 20-50404 Complaint by George L. Miller against White Line Collections, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives