Miller v. Wiesner Products, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50408 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Wiesner Products, Inc.
1333 Broadway 6th Floor
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, April 12, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/12 12:48 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50408 Closed (SS) |
||
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 03/23 10:10 AM
Notice of Settlement Sixth Notice of Settlement of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Settlement Procedures Order Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
mediation
Mediator's Certificate of Completion
Fri 02/05 4:00 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Felger Esq., Mark) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Mediation - Notice
Wed 01/13 11:10 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for February 3, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Sunday, December 20, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 12/21 1:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/20/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Fri 12/18 3:47 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Mark Felger is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Mediation Report due by 6/1/2021. Signed on 12/18/2020. (JS) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Fri 12/18 1:16 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 09/28 5:48 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Wiesner Products Inc. Soled Out Socks' First Set of Requests for Production and Interrogatories Filed by George L. Miller (Gentile, John) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Mon 09/14 4:46 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery re: (i) Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admission; (ii) Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production; and (iii) Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories Filed by Mystic Apparel LLC, Mystic Apparel LLC, Wiesner Products, Inc., Wiesner Products, Inc... (Slaugh, David) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 08/31 4:55 PM
Notice of Service Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Requests for Admissions Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation
Mon 08/24 3:44 PM
Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Discovery Requests Between Wiesner Products, Inc. and Plaintiff . Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Slaugh, David) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/29 5:29 PM
Notice of Service re: (i) Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents to George L. Miller, not Individually but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J&M Sales, Inc., et al.; (ii) Defendant's First Interrogatories to George L. Miller, not Individually but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J&M Sales, Inc., et al.; and (iii) Defendant's First Requests for Admissions to George L. Miller, not Individually but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J&M Sales, Inc., et al. Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc. (Slaugh, David) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/22 8:43 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 06/05 3:30 PM
Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dylan Trache, Esq. Order Signed on 6/5/2020. (RC) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Fri 06/05 2:44 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery re: Defendants Initial Rule 26 Disclosures Filed by Mystic Apparel LLC, Mystic Apparel LLC, Mystic Apparel LLC dba Premier Kitchen Products, Wiesner Products, Inc., Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Slaugh, David) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 06/05 2:37 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Dylan Trache, Esq . Receipt Number 2976153, Filed by Mystic Apparel LLC, Mystic Apparel LLC, Mystic Apparel LLC dba Premier Kitchen Products, Wiesner Products, Inc., Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Slaugh, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 05/06 3:31 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Ryan, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/06 3:30 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc. Mediation due date: 09/3/2020.(Ryan, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:48 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:19 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Saturday, February 08, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Sat 02/08 12:38 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Wiesner Products, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/8/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 01/24 12:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50408 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9613129, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 01/23 5:11 AM
Adversary case 20-50408 Complaint by George L. Miller against Wiesner Products, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |