Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50420
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2020
Terminated:Dec 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Living Doll, LLC
13071 Temple Avenue
City of Industry, CA 91746
Represented By
Living Doll, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc. et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, December 03, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/03 4:20 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50420 Closed (MB)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 07, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/08 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/08 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, November 05, 2020
11 11 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Thu 11/05 11:46 AM
Default Judgment against Living Doll, LLC. Related [+] Tickle due by: 11/19/2020. Signed on 11/5/2020. (MB)
Related: [-] 9
10 10 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 11/05 11:45 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Living Doll, LLC Related [+] Signed on 11/5/2020. (MB)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
9 9 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Wed 11/04 12:53 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 8 8
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgement By Default
8 8 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Wed 11/04 12:12 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 1:33 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 3:52 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Living Doll, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 24, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 01/24 12:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50420 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9613129, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2020
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 01/23 2:37 PM
Adversary case 20-50420 Complaint by George L. Miller against Living Doll, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives