Miller v. Lorency & Co, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50421 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Lorency & Co, LLC
1384 Broadway Suite 801
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc. et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 05/06 4:17 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case 20-50421 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/26 11:21 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50421 Closed (JS) |
||
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/23 12:48 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Fourth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019. Signed on 4/23/2021 (RC) |
|
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Thu 04/22 5:11 PM
Certificate of No Objection re: Plaintiffs Fourth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, April 01, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Thu 04/01 5:29 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Plaintiffs Fourth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 4/29/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/15/2021. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Wed 03/17 1:50 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 05/17/2021. (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Mediation - Notice
Wed 02/10 2:10 PM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for March 22, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, September 21, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Mediation - Notice
Mon 09/21 2:24 PM
Notice of Mediation to be held on October 19, 2020 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Saturday, August 15, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/16 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 08/15/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Wed 08/12 12:51 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding . Signed on 8/12/2020. (JS) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Tue 08/11 11:53 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 06/22 11:15 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/06 1:12 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Lorency & Co, LLC Mediation due date: 09/3/2020.(Donilon, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 1:33 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 3:54 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Lorency & Co, LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 01/24 12:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50421 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9613129, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 01/23 2:41 PM
Adversary case 20-50421 Complaint by George L. Miller against Lorency & Co, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |