Miller v. Luna International U.S.A. Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50422 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 07, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Luna International U.S.A. Inc.
123 Marcus Boulevard
Hauppauge, NY 11788 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc. et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 12/07 8:41 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50422 Closed (LBr) |
||
Saturday, November 07, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 11/08 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 11/08 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest
Thu 11/05 11:49 AM
Default Judgment Luna International U.S.A. Inc. Tickle due by: 11/19/2020. Signed on 11/5/2020. (MB) |
|
12 | 12
court
VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 11/05 11:49 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Luna International U.S.A. Inc. Signed on 11/5/2020. (MB) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv)
Wed 11/04 1:54 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgement By Default | ||
10 | 10
motion
Request for Entry of Default (Adv)
Wed 11/04 1:53 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 15, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation
Mon 06/15 4:12 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Luna International U.S.A. Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 20, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Wed 05/20 6:03 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between George L. Miller and Luna International U.S.A. Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 1:33 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 3:56 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Luna International U.S.A. Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 01/24 12:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50422 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9613129, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 01/23 2:46 PM
Adversary case 20-50422 Complaint by George L. Miller against Luna International U.S.A. Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |