Miller v. Real Underwear Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50439 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Real Underwear Inc.
389 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc. et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/05 12:34 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50439 Closed (ATo) |
||
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 03/04 12:58 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case 20-50439 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
mediation
Mediator's Certificate of Completion
Fri 02/19 10:08 AM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Felger Esq., Mark) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Mediation - Notice
Wed 01/13 11:13 AM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for February 18, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 01/06 4:21 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff=s Objections and Responses to Real Underwear Inc., dba Real Underwear Groups, First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Thu 12/17 6:35 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery // Notice of Service of Defendant's (i) First Request for Admissions to Plaintiff, (ii) First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, and (iii) First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Filed by Real Underwear Inc. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Tue 12/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 12/15 1:32 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, September 21, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Mediation - Notice
Mon 09/21 3:39 PM
Notice of Mediation to be held on November 4, 2020 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/15 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 08/14/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order)
Wed 08/12 11:44 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Mark Felger is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Mediation Report due by 2/12/2021. Signed on 8/12/2020. (JS) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Tue 08/11 12:10 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 05/27 2:33 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Filed by Real Underwear Inc. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 04/27 1:11 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Real Underwear Inc.. (Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/27 1:10 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Real Underwear Inc. Mediation due date: 08/25/2020.(Mangan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, April 02, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Transcript
Thu 04/02 2:31 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR: Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/1/2020 RE: Consolidate Adv 20-50430 and Adv 20-50117 Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/1/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, eScribeers, LLC, at Telephone number 973-406-2250. Filed by EScribers, LLC . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/9/2020. Redaction Request Due By 4/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/4/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/1/2020. (SS) Modified on 4/2/2020 (SS) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/26 3:13 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/07 10:14 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Real Underwear Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 01/24 12:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50439 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9613129, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 01/23 3:53 PM
Adversary case 20-50439 Complaint by George L. Miller against Real Underwear Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |