Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11668

New York Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Carl L Bucki
Case #: 1:20-ap-01002
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2020
Terminated:Apr 06, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sundra L. Ryce
135 Briarhill Road
Williamsville, NY 14221
Represented By
Sundra L. Ryce
contact info
Plaintiff
Ferguson Electric Construction Co., Inc.
333 Ellicott Street
Buffalo, NY 14203
Represented By
Mark J. Schlant
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, April 06, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/06 11:30 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1002 Closed (TEXT ONLY EVENT) (Flag set: CLOSED) (Leidolph, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Fri 03/20 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 03/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Stipulation of Settlement
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
11 11 court Certificate/Certified Copy Requested Wed 03/18 3:02 PM
Certificate/Certified Copy requested at the intake counter. A Certified Copy of Order Granting Stipulation of Settlemen by Mark J. Schlant Requestor Address: 1600 Main Place Tower 350 Main Street Buffalo, NY 14202. Receipt Number 9452, Fee Amount $ 12.00. (Leidolph, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
10 10 order Stipulation of Settlement Tue 03/17 2:11 PM
Order Granting Stipulation of Settlement Related [+]. Signed on 3/17/2020. (Leidolph, J.)
Related: [-] related doc(s)8 Stipulation of Settlement
Monday, March 16, 2020
8 8 motion Stipulation of Settlement Mon 03/16 2:08 PM
Stipulation of Settlement re: Judgment on Consent (Leidolph, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 02/19 2:35 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sundra L. Ryce 2/19/2020 and also served upon Daniel F. Brown, Esq. and Joseph W. Allen, Esq. on 2/19/2020 (Schlant, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2020
6 6 court Summons Issued Fri 02/14 12:11 PM
NEW Summons Issued on 2/14/2020 to Plaintiff or Plaintiffs Attorney upon request under Rule 7004(e) re: Defendant, Sundra L. Ryce . (Leidolph, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
5 5 misc Request Summons Thu 02/13 4:34 PM
Request Summons for Defendant Sundra L. Ryce. . Filed on behalf of Plaintiff Ferguson Electric Construction Co., Inc. (Schlant, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 01/24 12:35 PM
Summons Issued on 1/24/2020 to Plaintiff or Plaintiffs Attorney re: Defendant, Sundra L. Ryce . (Leidolph, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Fri 01/24 9:24 AM
Receipt Number A13701420, Fee Amount $350.00 for Adversary case 1:20-ap-1002 (TEXT ONLY EVENT) Related [+]. (Flag removed: DEFER) (Leidolph, J.)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ferguson Electric Construction Co., Inc.
Thursday, January 23, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 01/23 6:18 PM
Receipt of Statutory Fee for Complaint([LINK:1 20-01002 CLB] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt #A13701420, Amount Received $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/23 6:16 PM
Adversary case 1 20-01002 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny). Complaint Filed by Ferguson Electric Construction Co., Inc. vs Sundra L. Ryce. Statutory Fee Due: $350. (Flag set: AP, APpending) (Schlant, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Summons