Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-01266
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2020
Terminated:May 04, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 22, 2020 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
MITCHELL FAIRCLOTH
Represented By
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
2 2 16 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/06 2:35 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/4/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/24 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against All Defendants, filed by MITCHELL FAIRCLOTH. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]