DONOVAN v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-01087 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:20-cv-00173 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 22, 2020 5:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
JASON DONOVAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, March 16, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by JASON DONOVAN. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of JASON DONOVAN (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (djb) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-00173. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.] | |
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-173 JRT/KMM. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |