Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-01089
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2020
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:20-cv-00177
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 22, 2020 5:18 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER SMITH
Represented By
JEFF H ECKLAND
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
VINCE C REUTER
Eckland & Blando - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
JARED M REAMS
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, October 01, 2020
20 20 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Fri 10/02 8:15 AM
ORDER. Plaintiffs' motions to remand are DENIED. All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs are now reinstated as to Plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/1/2020. (sdw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2020
19 19 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Mon 04/13 4:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court Declaration of Vince C. Reuter filed by CHRISTOPHER SMITH. (REUTER, VINCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
18 18 28 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 04/13 4:51 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CHRISTOPHER SMITH. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Remand to State Court Mon 04/13 4:50 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by CHRISTOPHER SMITH. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2020
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/27 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of CHRISTOPHER SMITH (REAMS, JARED)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/27 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of CHRISTOPHER SMITH (REUTER, VINCE)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/27 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of CHRISTOPHER SMITH (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/13 4:25 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CHRISTOPHER SMITH. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2020
12 12 4 pgs order Order Mon 01/27 7:46 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
11 11 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 01/24 4:10 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-00177. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2020
10 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-50) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
9 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. 3M Occupational Safety LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Holding LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Holding LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.]
Related: [-]
8 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Holding LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Intermediate LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Intermediate LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.]
Related: [-]
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Intermediate LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE by Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2020
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-177 JRT/KMM. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7396542) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet