LOPEZ v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-01096 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:20-cv-00131 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 22, 2020 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AARON LOPEZ
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 01, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() ORDER. Plaintiffs' motions to remand are DENIED. All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs are now reinstated as to Plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/1/2020. (sdw) |
|
Tuesday, April 14, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() AFFIDAVIT in Support re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court Declaration of Vince C. Reuter filed by AARON LOPEZ. (REUTER, VINCE) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
18 | 18
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by AARON LOPEZ. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
17 | 17
![]() MOTION to Remand to State Court by AARON LOPEZ. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/14 2:56 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to17 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/28/2020) . (djb) |
||
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of AARON LOPEZ (REAMS, JARED) |
|
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of AARON LOPEZ (REUTER, VINCE) |
|
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of AARON LOPEZ (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by AARON LOPEZ. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (djb) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-00131. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Cheif Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-131 (JRT/KMM). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/24/2020.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |