Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:20-bk-30640
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2020
Creditor Meeting:Mar 03, 2020
Claims Deadline:Jul 13, 2020

Debtor
The Meridian Resource, LLC
16600 Park Row Ste 158
Houston, TX 77084-5019
Represented By
Randy W Williams
Byman & Associates PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Christopher R Murray
Jones Murray LLP 602 Sawyer St Ste 400
Houston, TX 77007
Represented By
Jon Maxwell Beatty
Daniels & Tredennick PLLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 09/26/2024 9:47 AM CDT
Friday, January 24, 2020
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) [system event] Fri 01/24 2:48 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by The Meridian Resource, LLC. (Williams, Randy)
Related: [-]